EP1386691 - Machine tool for machining fixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILG GmbH Hertzstrasse 4 70736 Fellbach / DE | [2005/47] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states ILG GmbH Ginsterhalde 56 71554 Weissach i.T. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilg, Herbert Ginsterhalde 56 71554 Weissach i. T. / DE | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017220.9 | 29.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | DE20022011744U | 30.07.2002 Original published format: DE 20211744 U | [2004/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386691 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1386691 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/62, B23Q1/48, B23Q1/01, B23Q39/02 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B23Q39/024 (EP);
B23Q7/03 (EP);
B23Q7/047 (EP);
B23Q2039/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine zum Bearbeiten von Futterteilen | [2004/06] | English: | Machine tool for machining fixtures | [2004/06] | French: | Machine-outil pour l'usinage de porte-pièces | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 28.12.2005 | |
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | ES | 08.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0568798 (EMAG MASCH VERTRIEBS SERV GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 16, line 43 - page 17, line 3; figures 30-34 * [Y] 5-10; | [X]DE4422416 (GRUENER MAGNUS DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7* the whole document *; | [Y]DE19904859 (GILDEMEISTER DREHMASCHINEN GMB [DE]) [Y] 5-10 * the whole document * |