EP1382599 - 2-(2,4 dihydroxyphenyl)-4,6 bis(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine and 2-(2,4-dihydroxyphenyl)4(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-6-(2,3-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine and derivatives thereof as UV-absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [2006/35] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gupta, Ram B. Unit 30, 511 West Main Street Stamford, CT 06902 / US | 02 /
Jakiela, Dennis J. 486 Grace Trail Orange, CT 06477 / US | 03 /
Venimadhavan, Sampath 15 Weatherly Lane Norwalk, CT 06854 / US | 04 /
Cappadona, Russel C. 63 Valley Court Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | 05 /
Pai, Venkatrao K. 63 Westover Lane Stamford, CT 06902 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Bowman, Paul Alan Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03017327.2 | 02.09.1999 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | US19980099176P | 04.09.1998 Original published format: US 99176 P | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1382599 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1382599 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382599 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/24, C08K5/3492 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
C07D251/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/04] | Title | German: | 2-(2,4 dihydroxyphenyl)-4,6 bis(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine und 2-(2,4-dihydroxyphenyl)4(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-6-(2,3-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine und ihre Derivate als UV-Absorber | [2004/04] | English: | 2-(2,4 dihydroxyphenyl)-4,6 bis(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine and 2-(2,4-dihydroxyphenyl)4(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-6-(2,3-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine and derivatives thereof as UV-absorber | [2004/04] | French: | 2-(2,4 dihydroxyphenyl)-4,6 bis(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine et 2-(2,4-dihydroxyphenyl)4(3,4-dimethylphenyl)-6-(2,3-dimethylphenyl)-s-triazine et leurs dérivés en tant qu'absorbeur d'UV | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99944075.3 / EP1109792 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2006 | BE | 30.08.2006 | CY | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | LU | 02.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | PT | 12.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
LU | 02.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3244708 (MAX DUENNENBERGER, et al) [Y] 1-3* columns 1-4; claims 16,25-29 *; | [Y] - J. KECK, M. ROESSLER, C. SCHROEDER, G. J. STUEBER, F. WAIBLINGER, M. STEIN, D. LE GOURRIÉREC ET AL, "Ultraviolet Absorbers of the 2-(2-Hydroxylaryl)-1,3,5-triazine Class and their Methoxy derivatives : Fluorescence Spectroscopy and X-ray Structure analysis", J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (1998), vol. 102, pages 6975 - 6985, XP002261753 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp9818380 |