EP1374713 - Buckle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Yoshihiko Takata Corp., 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Yutaka Takata Corp., 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | 03 /
Asako, Tadayuki Takata Corp., 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | 04 /
Shiota, Akihiro Takata Corp., 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017645.7 | 16.03.1999 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP19980065160 | 16.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6516098 | JP19990009731 | 18.01.1999 Original published format: JP 973199 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374713 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1374713 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/25 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A44B11/2523 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45623 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/01] | Title | German: | Schnalle | [2004/01] | English: | Buckle | [2004/01] | French: | Boucle | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/03] | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99104042.9 / EP0943252 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4575907 (TAKADA JUICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 66 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 6 *; | [A]US4885825 (KITAZAWA YASUHO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]US5357658 (TANAKA KOHBUN [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 51 - line 61 * * column 2, line 50 - line 55 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 31 * * column 5, line 38 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 3; claims 4,5,10,11 * |