EP1388968 - Bit error rate based system and method for optimizing communication system performance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, Nong 3512 Eboe Street 92606 Irvine California / US | 02 /
Hoang, Tuan 16021 Jenner Street 92656 Westminster California / US | 03 /
Jiang, Hongtao 2020 West Alameda Apt. 14L 92801 Anaheim California / US | 04 /
Jen, Keh-Chee 49 Legacy Way 92688 Las Flores California / US | [2012/29] |
Former [2004/07] | 01 /
Fan, Nong 3512 Eboe Street 92606 Irvine California / US | ||
02 /
Hoang, Tuan 16021 Jenner Street 92656 Westminster California / US | |||
03 /
Jiang, Hongtao 2020 West Alameda Apt. 14L 92801 Anaheim California / US | |||
04 /
Jen, Keh-Chee 49 Legacy Way 92688 Las Flores California / US | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/07] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017763.8 | 04.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | US20020402121P | 07.08.2002 Original published format: US 402121 P | US20030409293 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: US 409293 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388968 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388968 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/20 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
H04B10/07953 (EP,US);
H04B10/0799 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/45] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bitfehlerrate basiertes System und Verfahren zum Optimieren der Kommunikationssystemleistung | [2004/07] | English: | Bit error rate based system and method for optimizing communication system performance | [2004/07] | French: | Système et procédé fondé sur le taux d'erreur binaire pour optimiser la performance d'un système de communications | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.09.2012 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6112138 ; | [X]US5455536 (KONO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,9,11,14,16,17 * figures 2,3 *; | [XY]US5623355 (OLSEN JAMES J [US]) [X] 1-4,8-14,16,17 * see whole document * [Y] 7,15; | [XY]US5721756 (LIEBETREU JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-11,14,16,17 * figures 1,5 * [Y] 7,15; | [A]US2002072340 (HUTCHISON JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-17* figures 1,3,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860606), vol. 010, no. 158, Database accession no. (E - 409), & JP61012138 A 19860120 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [X] 1-5,10-14 * see abstract * |