EP1397029 - Circuit for operating a discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [2006/41] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Siegfried Herdegenstrasse 4 85452 Moosinning / DE | 02 /
Storm, Arwed E.Ollenhauer-Strasse 17h 85221 Dachau / DE | [2004/11] | Application number, filing date | 03017860.2 | 05.08.2003 | [2004/11] | Priority number, date | DE2002141327 | 04.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241327 | [2004/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1397029 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1397029 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1397029 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/282, H05B41/285 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H05B41/2855 (EP,US);
H05B41/285 (KR);
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
H05B41/282 (EP,US);
H05B41/2853 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/11] | H05B41/282 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb von Entladungslampen | [2004/11] | English: | Circuit for operating a discharge lamp | [2004/11] | French: | Circuit pour opérer une lampe de décharge | [2004/11] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 11.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | IE | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 11.10.2006 | |
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | SI | 11.10.2006 | |
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | SI | 11.10.2006 | |
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | SI | 11.10.2006 | |
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/13] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5471117 (RANGANATH KRISHNAPPA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5568041 (HESTERMAN BRYCE L [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5569984 (HOLTSLAG ANTONIUS H [NL]) [A] 1-10 * figure 13 *; | [A]US5598326 (LIU RUI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6172466 (KI WING HUNG [HK], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002014861 (HUI SHU-YUEN RON [HK], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 9 *; | [A]US6359394 (STEIN MITCHEL J [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1235468 (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * |