EP1393614 - Wrapping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viaud, Jean 6, rue Docteur Prieur 70100 Gray / FR | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03017904.8 | 06.08.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | DE2002139454 | 28.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10239454 | DE2002140091 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10240091 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1393614 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1393614 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07, A01F15/08 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
A01F15/071 (EP,US);
A01F15/0883 (EP,US);
A01F2015/0725 (EP);
A01F2015/0735 (EP,US);
A01F2015/074 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/10] | A01F15/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Wickelgerät | [2004/10] | English: | Wrapping device | [2004/10] | French: | Enrubanneuse | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4037533 (SCHENKE HELMUT [DE], et al); | [XA]WO9427423 (PARMITER P J & SONS [GB], et al); | [A]DE19806460 (WELGER GEB [DE]); | [XA]US6082076 (ANDERSON DAVID W [GB], et al); | [PXPA]WO02076183 (WELMOUNT LTD [IE], et al) | by applicant | WO9427423 | DE19806460 | EP1050207 | WO02076183 |