EP1506976 - Siloxane derivatives of 1,3-oxathiolane-2-thiones, their preparation and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uenishi, Kazuya 664-6-202 Kuchinoharu, Inatuki-cho Kaho-gun, Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Sudo, Atsushi 355-71-202 Arii, Shounai-cho Kaho-gun, Fukuoka / JP | 03 /
Morikawa, Hiroshi 355-44-203 Arii, Shounai-cho Kaho-gun, Fukuoka / JP | 04 /
Gentschev, Pavel Kapellstrasse 5 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
Lammerschop, Olaf Eutiner Strasse 32 47829 Krefeld / DE | 06 /
Huver, Thomas Paul-Pieper-Strasse 10 40625 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
Endo, Takeshi 4-3-16 Jonan, Yonezawa Yamagata 992-8510 / JP | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte, Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018504.5 | 15.08.2003 | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506976 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/28, C08G75/28, C08G75/14, C07F7/18 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
C08G77/28 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C08G75/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Title | German: | Siloxanderivate von 1,3-Oxathiolan-2-thionen, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [2005/07] | English: | Siloxane derivatives of 1,3-oxathiolane-2-thiones, their preparation and use thereof | [2005/07] | French: | Dérivés siloxaniques de 1,3-Oxathiolane-2-thiones, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [2005/07] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 08.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2002047424 ; | [XDY]JPH11246632 ; | [Y]US3278484 (TESORO GIULIANA C) [Y] 1-25 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US3700715 (BERGER ABE) [Y] 1-25 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9702270 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0943660 (KYOWA YUKA KK [JP]) [A] 1-25 * claim 1 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002047424 A 20020212 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [X] 1-4,12-14,16-23 * abstract * [Y] 1-25 | [XDY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11246632 A 19990914 (KYOWA YUKA KK) [XD] 1-4,12-14,16-23 * abstract * [Y] 1-25 | [A] - CHOI W ET AL, "A NOVEL CONSTRUCTION OF LIVING POLYMERIZATION BY NEIGHBORING GROUP PARTICIPATION: LIVING CATIONIC RING-OPENING POLYMERIZATION OF A FIVE-MEMBERED CYCLIC DITHIOCARBONATE", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19981215), vol. 31, no. 25, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 9093 - 9095, XP000788852 [A] 1-25 * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma9805102 | [A] - TAKESHI MORIGUCHI ET AL, "POLYADDITION OF BIFUNCTIONAL DITHIOCARBONATES DERIVED FROM EPOXIDESAND CARBON DISULFIDE SYNTHESIS OF NOVEL POLY(THIOURETHANES)", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19950717), vol. 28, no. 15, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 5386 - 5387, XP000515368 [A] 1-25 * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00119a035 |