EP1416187 - Rolling-lobe air spring with bell-shaped support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oldenettel, Holger Altes Dorf 6 30900 Wedemark / DE | 02 /
Gleu, Jens-Uwe, Dr. Hannoversche Strasse 43 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [2004/19] | Application number, filing date | 03018883.3 | 20.08.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | DE2002149741 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10249741 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1416187 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1416187 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416187 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/05 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B60G11/28 (EP,US);
F16F9/0454 (EP,US);
F16F9/05 (EP,US);
B60G2204/126 (EP,US);
B60G2204/416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | Rollbalg-Luftfeder mit Stützglocke | [2004/19] | English: | Rolling-lobe air spring with bell-shaped support | [2004/19] | French: | Ressort pneumatique à soufflet avec support en forme de cloche | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.05.2007 | CZ | 09.05.2007 | DK | 09.05.2007 | EE | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | GB | 09.05.2007 | IE | 09.05.2007 | IT | 09.05.2007 | NL | 09.05.2007 | RO | 09.05.2007 | SI | 09.05.2007 | SK | 09.05.2007 | TR | 09.05.2007 | BG | 09.08.2007 | SE | 09.08.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | AT | 20.08.2007 | ES | 20.08.2007 | LU | 20.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | CH | 31.08.2007 | LI | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | HU | 10.11.2007 | FR | 04.01.2008 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 09.05.2007 | |
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
AT | 20.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
LU | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 09.05.2007 | |
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
AT | 20.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
AT | 20.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
AT | 20.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
FR | 04.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
IT | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
GB | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 20.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3010715 (SLEMMONS CHARLES O, et al); | [A]GB1001515 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO); | [X]US3904181 (HARSY-VADAS GABOR) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2117866 (PIRELLI); | [DX]DE4325576 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE19616476 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]EP0852188 (GATES CORP [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19704433 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [A]FR2762550 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]); | [PX]FR2827551 (CF GOMMA SPA [IT]) [PX] 1,2 * figures 2,4 * | by applicant | DE4325576 |