EP1508763 - Method for providing a heat exchanger with a vent tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/08] | Heat exchanger with vent tube | ||
[2007/29] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balcke-Dürr GmbH Hans-Joachim-Balcke-Strasse 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grobelny, Hans-Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Kantstrasse 39a 44627 Herne / DE | 02 /
Schwarzer, Walter, Ing.-grad. Worth 23 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Lang, Friedrich Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Lang, Friedrich Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | Lang, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Lang & Tomerius, Bavariaring 29 80366 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018961.7 | 21.08.2003 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508763 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508763 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/06, F28F9/00 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
F28D7/06 (EP,US);
F28F9/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Extension states | AL | 04.03.2005 | LT | 04.03.2005 | LV | 04.03.2005 | MK | 04.03.2005 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anordnung eines Entlüftungsrohres in einem Wärmetauscher | [2007/29] | English: | Method for providing a heat exchanger with a vent tube | [2007/29] | French: | Procédé d'installation d'un tuyau de dégazification dans un échangeur de chaleur | [2007/29] |
Former [2005/08] | Wärmetauscher mit Entlüftungsrohr | ||
Former [2005/08] | Heat exchanger with vent tube | ||
Former [2005/08] | Echangeur de chaleur avec tuyau de dégazification | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2008
05.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALSTOM Technology Ltd CHTI-Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7/664/2 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2008
ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Str. 7/664/2 CH-5401 Baden / CH | 15.09.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.03.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2010 | 11.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.12.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | GB | 07.11.2007 | IE | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | LU | 21.08.2008 | FR | 22.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | IT | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
LU | 21.08.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
LU | 21.08.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 21.08.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
FR | 22.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2720259 (JACOBY HAROLD E) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 9 - line 66; figure - *; | [X]DE1098954 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4224981 (DATZ RUDOLF, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 12 - line 35; figure - * [A] 7; | [A]US4226283 (FURUKAWA MASAHIRO, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5853549 (SEPHTON HUGO H [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 45 - line 55; figure - *; | [A]DE19953612 (ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * |