EP1406137 - Electronic fingerprints for machine control and production machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiesel, Martin Jahnstrasse 36 91099 Poxdorf / DE | 02 /
Mutscheller, Wolfgang, Dr. Hohenzollernstrasse 17 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/15] | Application number, filing date | 03019016.9 | 21.08.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | US20020226979 | 23.08.2002 Original published format: US 226979 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406137 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1406137 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/05, G05B19/406 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G05B19/406 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31422 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34282 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50197 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/25] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronischer Fingerabdruck zur Maschinensteuerung und Produktionsmaschinen | [2004/15] | English: | Electronic fingerprints for machine control and production machines | [2004/15] | French: | Empreintes électroniques pour une commande de machine et de machines de production | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5586041 (MANGRULKAR SURESH M [US]) [X] 1-3,6-15,17-25 * column 3, line 56 - column 14, line 23; figures 1-13 *; | [Y]WO9922489 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 16 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 14 *; | [Y]US5966897 (KIRKA ARDE [US], et al) [Y] 6,10,21 * column 6, line 60 - column 9, line 65 ** column 5, line 13 - column 5, line 27 *; | [XY]WO0205199 (METSO FIELD SYSTEMS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-15,17-20,22-25 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figure 4 * [Y] 4,6,10,16,21; | [Y] - HOSKE M T, "NEW CNC CONTROLLER IS FULLY OPEN", CONTROL ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (199611), vol. 43, no. 15, ISSN 0010-8049, pages 69 - 70, XP000682156 [Y] 4 * page 70, column R, paragraph L * |