EP1508591 - Wrapping material for seamless capsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voigt, Ines Reismühle 20 22087 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schleifenbaum, Birgit Route de la Versoix 5 1299 Crans pres Celigny / CH | 03 /
Aickele, Frank Weisse Breite 15 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Eisenführ, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019044.1 | 22.08.2003 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508591 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508591 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L3/02, A61K9/48 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
A61K9/4816 (EP);
B01J13/04 (EP);
C08L3/02 (EP);
A61J3/07 (EP);
C08L5/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L2666/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | Hüllmaterial für nahtlose Kapseln | [2005/08] | English: | Wrapping material for seamless capsules | [2005/08] | French: | Matériau d'enrobage pour gélules sans soudure | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 24.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.05.2006 | CZ | 10.05.2006 | EE | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | GB | 10.05.2006 | IE | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | RO | 10.05.2006 | SI | 10.05.2006 | SK | 10.05.2006 | TR | 10.05.2006 | BG | 10.08.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | AT | 22.08.2006 | LU | 22.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | HU | 11.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
LU | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
HU | 11.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
HU | 11.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
RO | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
GB | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
SI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SI | 10.05.2006 | |
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SI | 10.05.2006 | |
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 10.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH07196478 ; | [DA]EP0389700 (FUJI CAPSULE KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [DA] 1-20* page 3, lines 18-45 *; | [DA]US6214376 (GENNADIOS ARISTIPPOS [US]) [DA] 1-20 * column 3, line 19 - column 6, line 36 *; | [DXA]US6375981 (GILLELAND GREGORY M [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,9,11-17 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 45 * * column 4, lines 19-29 * [A] 4-8,10,18-20 | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07196478 A 19950801 (HAJIME SUGII) [DX] 1-20 * abstract * |