blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1510600

EP1510600 - Process and apparatus for the deposition of metal and metal alloys from organometallic electrolytes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aluminal Oberflächtentechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Auf der Heide
56424 Staudt / DE
[2005/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Heller, Jörg, Dr.
Am Lohmühlchen 28
51766 Engelskirchen / DE
02 / De Vries, Hans
Zuppeldseweg 15
8181 NG Heerde / NL
 [2005/09]
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date03019235.526.08.2003
[2005/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1510600
Date:02.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:C25D17/00, C25D5/00, C25D3/42
[2005/09]
CPC:
C25D17/00 (EP,US); C25D17/02 (EP,US); C25D5/003 (EP,US);
C25D3/42 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/47]
Former [2005/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden von Metallen und Metalllegierungen aus Metallorganischen Elektrolyten[2005/09]
English:Process and apparatus for the deposition of metal and metal alloys from organometallic electrolytes[2005/09]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour le revêtement de métal et alliages de métaux à partir d'électrolytes organométalliques[2005/09]
Examination procedure03.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
02.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.10.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.10.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4363712  (BIRKLE SIEGFRIED, et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12,14-22,25 * column 3, lines 28-46; figure 1; claim 1 * * column 4, lines 1-34 * * column 6, lines 16,17,33-38 * * column 7, lines 10-16,26-29 *;
 [X]US4425211  (BIRKLE SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,11-22,25 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-22 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, lines 8-62 * * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 17 * * column 9, lines 26-41 *;
 [XY]US4435265  (BIRKLE SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,11,12,14-22,25 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 45; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, lines 25-28 * [Y] 3,4,10,23,24;
 [YA]US4759831  (BIRKLE SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4,10,23,24 * column 2, lines 37-42 * * column 3, lines 5-9,40-48 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 25 * * column 5, lines 42-64 * * figure 1; claims 1,7 *[A] 1,6,9,11,13-18,20
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.