blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1411449

EP1411449 - Calculation of values using hierarchical networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2007
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metzger, Uwe
Bahnhofstrasse 40
85567 Grafing / DE
[2004/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Metzger, Uwe
Bahnhofstrasse 40
85567 Grafing / DE
 [2004/17]
Application number, filing date03019420.328.08.2003
[2004/17]
Priority number, datedeleted
[2006/34]
Former [2004/17]DE200214774810.10.2002
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1411449
Date:21.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1411449
Date:17.01.2007
[2007/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2006
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/50
[2004/17]
CPC:
G06Q30/06 (EP); G06F30/00 (EP); G06Q10/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Werteberechnung mittels Hierarchischer Netze[2004/17]
English:Calculation of values using hierarchical networks[2004/17]
French:Calcul de valeurs à l'aide de réseaux hiérarchiques[2004/17]
Examination procedure02.06.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
05.04.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001
01.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/36]
16.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200503   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2005
31.08.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5201046  (GOLDBERG ROBERT N [US], et al) [A] 1,19-22 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 29 ** figures 1,2,4-8 *;
 [Y]WO9707471  (HAUSMAN ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 4, line 15 - line 30 * * page 8, line 6 - page 10, line 17 * * figures 22,23 * * tables 3,4 *;
 [A]WO9733242  (ELECTRONIC DATA SYST CORP [US]) [A] 1,19-22 * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 13 * * claim 18 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5708798  (LYNCH JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,19-22 * column 5, line 28 - column 7, line 28 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]EP1231552  (SAP AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DY]  - GÖPFERT ET AL, "Modulare Produktentwicklung leistet mehr", HARVARD BUSINESS MANAGER, (2000), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.id-consult.de/de/publikationen/pdf/modulare_produktentwicklun.pdf, (20061204), XP008072073 [DY] 1-22 * page 10, line 10 - page 15 * * figures 3-5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.