EP1510286 - Method and device for changing a tool or workpiece in a machine tool with a tool or workpiece characteristics detecting means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolf Helle GmbH Kernerstrasse 9 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helle, Rolf Kernerstrasse 9 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Jakelski, Joachim Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Jakelski, Joachim, Dr. Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019451.8 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510286 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510286 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/20, B23Q17/22, G05B19/401 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G05B19/401 (EP);
B23Q17/22 (EP);
B23Q17/2233 (EP);
G05B2219/50063 (EP);
G05B2219/50139 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Werkzeug- oder Werkstückumrüstung einer Bearbeitungsmaschine mit einer Abtasteinrichtung | [2005/09] | English: | Method and device for changing a tool or workpiece in a machine tool with a tool or workpiece characteristics detecting means | [2005/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de changement de pièce ou d'outil dans une machine-outil avec des moyens de détection des caractéristiques de la pièce ou outil | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 24.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4022799 (SCHAUDT MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5532932 (NIWA TOMOMITSU [JP]) [A] 7-12,20-22* the whole document *; | [X]DE19711500 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-6,13-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0899058 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,13-19 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19840801 (WALTER AG NIEDERLASSUNG VIALOG [DE]) [X] 1-6,13-19 * the whole document * |