EP1376461 - Memory card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Seiji 3-25, Taharadai 1-chome Shijonawate-shi Osaka 575-0013 / JP | 02 /
Torii, Takashi 4-2-2-605, Sekime Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0008 / JP | 03 /
Furuta, Noriaki 1-6-15, Aoyama Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2101 / JP | 04 /
Sakamoto, Takahiro 2-30, Kawaharacho Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0028 / JP | 05 /
Yano, Masayoshi 11-12, Ikagasakaemachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0062 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2004/01] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03019599.4 | 21.08.2000 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | JP19990236734 | 24.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23673499 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376461 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376461 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G06K19/077, G11C5/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G06K19/07743 (EP,US);
G06F1/16 (KR);
G06K19/073 (EP,US);
G06K19/07732 (EP,US);
Y10S439/945 (EP,US);
Y10S439/946 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] | Title | German: | Speicherkarte | [2004/01] | English: | Memory card | [2004/01] | French: | Carte memoire | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/24] | 10.02.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00953547.7 / EP1207493 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0533463 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2* abstract *; | [Y]US5539600 (LEE RITCHIE J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0887742 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * |