EP1510282 - Device for remote machining workpieces with a laser machining beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trumpf Laser- und Systemtechnik GmbH Johann-Maus-Strasse 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Trumpf Laser- und Systemtechnik GmbH Johann-Maus-Strasse 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horn, Armin Eltinger Weg 5/1 71272 Renningen / DE | 02 /
Andreasch, Wolfgang Weinbergstr. 2/1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | 03 /
Kaupp, Peter Allgäuerstr. 47 71069 Sindelfingen / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
Dr. Armin Horn Eltinger Weg 5/1 71272 Renningen / DE | ||
02 /
Dr. Wolfgang Andreasch Weinbergstr. 2/1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | |||
03 /
Peter Kaupp Allgäuerstr. 47 71069 Sindelfingen / DE | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019721.4 | 29.08.2003 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510282 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510282 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/04 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B23K26/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Remote-Bearbeiten von Werkstücken mittels eines Laserbearbeitungsstrahls | [2005/09] | English: | Device for remote machining workpieces with a laser machining beam | [2005/09] | French: | Dispositif d'usinage à distance de pièces au moyen d'un faisceau laser d'usinage | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | IE | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | AT | 29.08.2008 | LU | 29.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | GB | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 09.07.2008 | |
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
AT | 29.08.2008 | ||
LU | 29.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GB | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
AT | 29.08.2008 | ||
LU | 29.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GB | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
AT | 29.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GB | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
AT | 29.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GB | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
AT | 29.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH11156578 ; | [A]US5380978 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002162973 (CORDINGLEY JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1,9* the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11156578 A 19990615 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * [A] 4,10 |