EP1398836 - Differential amplifier comprising thin film transistors with different threshold voltages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/12] | Thin film semiconductor device and manufacturing method | ||
[2021/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gold Charm Limited Offshore Chambers P.O.Box 217 Apia / WS | [2021/29] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Gold Charm Limited Offshore Chambers P.O.Box 217 Apia / WS | ||
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchi, Hiroshi NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sera, Kenji NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2021/29] |
Former [2004/12] | 01 /
Tsuchi, Hiroshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Sera, Kenji NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/29] |
Former [2013/08] | Gray, John James, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020276.6 | 08.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | JP20020263606 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002263606 | JP20030285780 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003285780 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398836 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398836 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398836 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, G11C7/06 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
H01L27/127 (EP,US);
G11C7/062 (EP,US);
H01L27/1218 (EP,US);
H03F3/45192 (EP,US);
H03F3/45219 (EP,US);
H03K19/0016 (EP,US);
H03K5/2481 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | H01L27/12, H01L21/84, G11C7/06, H03K5/24, H03F3/45 | ||
Former IPC [2004/12] | H01L27/12, H01L21/84 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2021/29] |
Former [2007/22] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Differentialverstärker mit Dünnfilmtransistoren mit unterschiedlichen Schwellspannungen | [2021/18] | English: | Differential amplifier comprising thin film transistors with different threshold voltages | [2021/18] | French: | Amplificateur différentiel comprenant des transistors à couche mince avec différentes tensions de seuil | [2021/12] |
Former [2004/12] | Dünnfilm-Halbleiterbauelement und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2004/12] | Thin film semiconductor device and manufacturing method | ||
Former [2004/12] | Dispositif semiconducteur à couche mince et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP07020221.3 / EP1873786 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08264798 ; | [XA]JPS61100010 ; | [A]JPH0729381 ; | [XA]US4446390 (ALASPA ALLAN A [US]) [X] 18,19 * the whole document * [A] 12-14; | [X]US4872010 (LARSON LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 27; table 1 *; | [A]US5162681 (LEE JEONG-RYEOL [KR]) [A] 20-52 * column 1, line 56 - line 61; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0614226 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-11,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5461713 (PASCUCCI LUIGI [IT]) [A] 18,19 * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 22 *; | [A]EP0690510 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0809362 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 12-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US5808934 (KUBO KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 21-52 * column 7, line 13 - line 27; figure 14 *; | [XY]US5889291 (KOYAMA JUN [JP], et al) [X] 18,19 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 61; figures 2A-2E * [Y] 12-14; | [Y]US6034563 (MASHIKO KOICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 12-14 * column 10, line 44 - line 47 *; | [A]US6191435 (INOUE SHUNSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-11,15-17 * column 9, paragraph 17 - paragraph 41 *; | [A]US6190952 (XIANG QI [US], et al) [A] 1-11,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6215159 (FUJITA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 12-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1091491 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 20-52 * column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 *; | [A]US6246221 (XI XIAOYU [US]) [A] 24-34 * column 3, line 35 - line 45 *; | [XA]US6306709 (MIYAGI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 15,16 * column 21, line 53 - column 23, line 5 * [A] 1-11,17; | [X]US2001035774 (KOTANI NAOKI [JP]) [X] 1-11,15-17,20 * page 1, paragraph 12 - page 2, paragraph 20 *; | [A]US6353244 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11,15-17* the whole document *; | [A]EP1217662 (UNIV LOUVAIN [BE]) [A] 12-14 * page 2, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US2002088971 (TEZUKA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002096723 (AWAKA KAORU [JP]) [A] 12-14 * page 1, paragraph 8 - paragraph 9 *; | [X]US2002098635 (ZHANG HONGYONG [JP], et al) [X] 18,19 * page 7, paragraph 98 - page 8, paragraph 113 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08264798 A 19961011 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [DA] 1-11,15-17 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860920), vol. 010, no. 279, Database accession no. (E - 439), & JP61100010 A 19860519 (SONY CORP) [X] 21-23,35-52 * abstract * [A] 24-34 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07029381 A 19950131 (OKI MICRO DESIGN MIYAZAKI:KK; others: 01) [A] 20-52 * abstract * |