EP1515464 - Method for establishing a telecommunication connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stehlik, Günther Otto-Probst-Pl. 8/1/8 1100 Wien / AT | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al European Patent Attorney, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020321.0 | 09.09.2003 | [2005/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1515464 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04M1/2745, H04M11/08, H05K11/00, H04H9/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
H04M11/085 (EP);
H04H60/80 (EP);
H04H20/38 (EP);
H04H20/93 (EP);
H04H2201/30 (EP);
H04H60/94 (EP);
H04M1/2757 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/49] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbau einer Telekommunikationsverbindung | [2005/11] | English: | Method for establishing a telecommunication connection | [2005/11] | French: | Méthode pour établir une connection de télécommunication | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9735428 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]GB2312591 (CARRUTHERS JAMES FRANKLIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]US2003054804 (BRANDES AXEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraph [0045] * |