|
22.10.2007 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
53 |