Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7311586 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2007 | B2 | US2006128277 | 15.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34519906 | 31.01.2006 | US2793501 | 20.12.2001 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7044838 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2006 | B2 | US2004171331 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2137201 | 30.10.2001 | US78977304 | 27.02.2004 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4212776B | Global Dossier | 21.01.2009 | B2 | JP2002539620 | 19.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | IB0000508 | 24.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3595266B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | B2 | JP2002538611 | 12.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | IB0000513 | 01.03.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1837122 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2009 | B1 | EP1837122 | 17.10.2007 | A3 | EP1837122 | 26.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03020525 | 24.02.2000 | EP00919082 | 24.02.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1437197 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2006 | B1 | EP1437197 | 14.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00915318 | 01.03.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1091829 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2003 | B1 | EP1091829 | 18.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | IB0000508 | 24.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1075351 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2004 | B1 | EP1075351 | 14.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0000513 | 01.03.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1371449 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2004 | A3 | EP1371449 | 17.12.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP00919082 | 24.02.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE249909T | 15.10.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | IB0000508 | 24.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE268247T | 15.06.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | IB0000513 | 01.03.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60005270T | 30.09.2004 | T2 | DE60005270D1 | 23.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | IB0000508 | 24.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60011193T | 07.07.2005 | T2 | DE60011193D1 | 08.07.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IB0000513 | 01.03.2000 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1037156 | 01.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | IB0000508 | 24.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001007810 | 12.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US78281801 | 13.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7029382 | 18.04.2006 | B2 | US2002077045 | 20.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2793501 | 20.12.2001 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002173242 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2137201 | 30.10.2001 | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6231428 | 15.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6309290 | 30.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0054933 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2001 | B1 | WO0054933 | 25.01.2001 | A3 | WO0054933 | 21.09.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0051782 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2001 | B1 | WO0051782 | 08.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100419135B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2004 | B1 | KR20010043270 | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100387385B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2003 | B1 | KR20010043277 | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5185958B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2013 | B2 | JP2010120160 | 03.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008302495 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004048082 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE333342T | 15.08.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE450345T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60029490T | 08.02.2007 | T2 | DE60029490D1 | 31.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60043469D1 | 14.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW534850B | 01.06.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI243084B | 11.11.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6368189 | 09.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US29454799 | 19.04.1999 | US26111299 | 03.03.1999 | US39014299 | 03.09.1999 | Type | Divisional application | EP1837122 | Type | Earlier application | EP1091829 |