EP1434167 - Noncontact type IC card with voltage level detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Hitoshi Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/27] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020890.4 | 15.09.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020374712 | 25.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002374712 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434167 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434167 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G06K19/0712 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K19/0707 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/12] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kontaklose Chip-Karte mit einem Spannungspegeldetektor | [2004/27] | English: | Noncontact type IC card with voltage level detector | [2004/27] | French: | Carte à puce sans contact comportant un détecteur de niveau de tension | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.10.2008 | DE | 01.04.2009 | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/39] | DE | 01.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5418358 (BRUHNKE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 48 *; | [A]US5945920 (MALETSKY KERRY D [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8* column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 15 *; | [A]US6070804 (MIYAMOTO TAIYUU [JP]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 4, line 39 - column 7, line 25 * |