EP1398692 - Method of supporting multiple languages for mobile communication terminal and communication system for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sung-Dae Samsung Elec. Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020899.5 | 15.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | KR20020055944 | 14.09.2002 Original published format: KR 2002055944 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398692 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398692 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/445, H04Q7/32, H04L29/06, G06F17/21, G06T11/60 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
H04L67/75 (EP,US);
G06F9/454 (EP,US);
H04L67/5682 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
G06F8/654 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/12] | G06F9/44, G06F9/445, H04Q7/32, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/16] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrere Sprachen unterstützende Methode für für mobiles Kommunikationsendgerät und entsprechende Kommunikationssystemvorrichtung | [2004/20] | English: | Method of supporting multiple languages for mobile communication terminal and communication system for the same | [2004/12] | French: | Méthode de supportant plusieurs langues pour une terminal de communication mobile et système de communication correspondant | [2004/12] |
Former [2004/12] | Mehrere Sprachen unterstützende Methode für mobiles Kommunikationsendgerät und entsprechende Kommunikationssystemvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5838972 (MATSUZUKA SHINOBU [US], et al) [A] 4-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US6111654 (CARTIER BRIAN GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 4-19 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2355563 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 4-19 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 7 * * page 8, line 11 - page 13, line 26 *; | [Y]US6345298 (MORIYA KOJI [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 5, line 60 *; | [XY]EP1231798 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,20 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [X]US2002123335 (LUNA MICHAEL E S [US], et al) [X] 4-19 * the whole document *; | [A] - ADOBE DEVELOPER SUPPORT, "Adobe Binary Screen Font Files Specification", INTERNET, (1992), URL: www.wotsit.org, (20040308), XP002272737 [A] 7-17 * the whole document * |