EP1518870 - SEPARATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/13] | Separating material | ||
[2018/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | [2018/48] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Egbert Im Erlich 10 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Storr, Markus Hinterhofstr. 41/1 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
Freudemann, Wolfgang Am Fürstengarten 16 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Hornung, Veronika Margot c/o Gambro Dialysatoren GmbH Holger-Crafoord-Strasse 26 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2018/48] |
Former [2014/09] | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Weber, Roland, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Patentanwälte Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020986.0 | 17.09.2003 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518870 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518870 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F291/00, C08F271/00, C08F285/00, C08F265/00, C08F267/00, B01D53/00, B01J20/00, A61M1/36, A61K39/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B01J20/22 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D63/026 (EP);
B01D67/0006 (EP);
B01D67/0018 (EP);
B01D69/08 (EP);
B01D71/401 (EP,US);
B01D71/78 (EP);
B01J20/26 (EP);
B01J20/28023 (EP);
B01J20/28033 (EP);
C08F257/02 (EP);
C08F265/04 (EP);
C08F265/10 (EP);
C08F271/00 (EP);
C08F285/00 (EP);
C08F291/00 (EP);
A61M1/3679 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/48] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRENNUNGSMATERIAL | [2018/39] | English: | SEPARATING MATERIAL | [2018/39] | French: | MATIÈRE DE SÉPARATION | [2018/39] |
Former [2005/13] | Trennungsmaterial | ||
Former [2005/13] | Separating material | ||
Former [2005/13] | Matière de séparation | Examination procedure | 12.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10181793.0 / EP2261271 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 03.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 04.05.2009 | [2009/25] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2003 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4097420 (MIKES OTAKAR, et al); | [A]EP0052156 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0109531 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]); | [A]EP0278100 (GAMBRO AB [SE]); | [A]WO9113098 (RISOE FORSKNINGSCENTER [DK]); | [X]US5215692 (HOERL HANS-HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US5344560 (SUGO TAKANOBU [JP], et al); | [X]US5476509 (KEOGH JAMES R [US], et al); | [XY]US5556708 (HOERL HANS-HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [X]US5967714 (OTTERSBACH PETER [DE], et al); | [A]US6096800 (OTTERSBACH PETER [DE], et al); | [A]WO0119878 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]WO0123413 (GAMBRO DIALYSATOREN [DE]); | [X]WO0192359 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE], et al) |