EP1517415 - Geodetic apparatus with laser source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Geosystems AG Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braunecker, Bernhard, Dr. Haldenweg 10 9445 Rebstein / CH | 02 /
Gächter, Bernhard, Dr. Kapfstrasse 4 b 9436 Balgach / CH | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Kaminski, Susanne, et al Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Kaminski, Susanne, Dr., et al Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 03021085.0 | 18.09.2003 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1517415 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/14, H01S5/065, G01C1/02, G01S17/89, G01C3/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G01S7/4814 (EP,US);
G01C15/002 (EP,US);
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
G01S7/4818 (EP,US);
G01S7/484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/50] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geodätisches Gerät mit einer Laserquelle | [2005/12] | English: | Geodetic apparatus with laser source | [2005/12] | French: | Appareil géodésique comprenant une source laser | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5703897 (WELCH DAVID F [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 13, lines 45-59; figures 19,20 *; | [X] - ANDREEVA E V ET AL, "PASSIVE MODE LOCKING IN A MULTISEGMENT LASER DIODE WITH AN EXTERNAL CAVITY", QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (199902), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 1063-7818, pages 103 - 108, XP000847223 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/qe1999v029n02ABEH001425 | [X] - EISENSTEIN G ET AL, "ACTIVE MODE-LOCKING CHARACTERISTICS OF INGAASP-SINGLE MODE FIBER COMPOSITE CAVITY LASERS", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (1986), vol. QE-22, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 142 - 148, XP000705567 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.1986.1072876 |