EP1400716 - Clutch system and holding arrangement to hold at least one clutch arrangement of the clutch system in a temporary or predetermined engagement state [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebert, Angelika Rossbrunnstrasse 18 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
Müller, Ingo Hermann-Löns-Strasse 26 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 03 /
Grosspietsch, Wolfgang Matthias-Grünewald-Ring 20 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 04 /
Wirth, Thomas Goethestrasse 11 97523 Schwanfeld / DE | 05 /
Heiartz, Markus Sterntalerweg 127 97084 Würzburg / DE | 06 /
Orlamünder, Andreas Hartlaubstrasse 1 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 07 /
Reisser, Wolfgang Herman-Löns-Strasse 30 97526 Sennfeld / DE | [2004/13] | Application number, filing date | 03021283.1 | 19.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | EP20020021052 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02021052 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400716 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400716 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/06, F16D25/12 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F16D28/00 (EP);
F16D21/06 (EP);
F16D23/14 (EP);
F16D25/087 (EP);
F16D25/12 (EP);
F16D2021/0607 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/51] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kupplungssystem und Halteanordnung zum Halten wenigstens einer Kupplungsanordnung des Kupplungssystems in einem momentanen oder vorgegebenen Einrückzustand | [2004/13] | English: | Clutch system and holding arrangement to hold at least one clutch arrangement of the clutch system in a temporary or predetermined engagement state | [2004/13] | French: | Système d'embrayage et dispositif de retenue pour retenir au moins un embrayage du système d'embrayage dans un état temporaire ou dans un état d'engagement prédéterminé | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2991863 (GLESMANN HERBERT C, et al) [X] 1-9,12,14-16 * column 3, line 57 - line 65; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US2001030099 (FLIEGE HANS [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0019] * |