EP1380731 - Apparatus and method for purifying exhaust gases in automotive engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashiki, Zenichiro c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Vollnhals, Aurel Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner (GbR), TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021300.3 | 31.08.2000 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP19990249971 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: JP 24997199 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1380731 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1380731 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380731 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/18, F01N3/20 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
F01N3/0842 (EP);
B01D53/9495 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N3/0814 (EP);
F02D41/0255 (EP);
F02D41/0275 (EP);
F02D41/3076 (EP);
F02D2041/389 (EP);
F02D2200/0802 (EP);
F02D2200/0804 (EP);
F02D2200/0806 (EP);
F02D2200/501 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Abgasen von Kraftfahrzeugmotoren | [2004/03] | English: | Apparatus and method for purifying exhaust gases in automotive engines | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour purifier les gaz d'échappement de moteurs d'automobiles | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00118851.5 / EP1081360 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed |