EP1408120 - Detection of vancomycin-resistant Enterococcus spp. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cockerill, Franklin R., III 709 9th Avenue S.W. Rochester Minnesota 55905 / US | 02 /
Sloan, Lynne M. 2853 Stonegate Court S.W. Rochester Minnesota 55902 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/16] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr. Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021347.4 | 20.09.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | US20020254260 | 25.09.2002 Original published format: US 254260 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1408120 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1408120 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408120 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | Detektion von Vancomycin-resistenten Enterococcus-Subspezies | [2004/16] | English: | Detection of vancomycin-resistant Enterococcus spp. | [2004/16] | French: | Détection des sous-espèces d'Enterococcus vancomycin-résistantes | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | BE | 19.07.2006 | CY | 19.07.2006 | CZ | 19.07.2006 | EE | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | RO | 19.07.2006 | SI | 19.07.2006 | SK | 19.07.2006 | TR | 19.07.2006 | IE | 20.09.2006 | LU | 20.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | BG | 19.10.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | SE | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | HU | 20.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
TR | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
LU | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
HU | 20.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
HU | 20.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 19.07.2006 | |
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 19.07.2006 | |
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0112803 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [Y] 2 * page 26, lines 10-13 *; | [Y]WO0123604 (INFECTIO DIAGNOSTIC INC [CA], et al) [Y] 2,3 * page 1019 * * page 1022 * * page 1029 * * page 1070 * * claim 21 *; | [PX]WO03068918 (UNIV AUBURN [US], et al) [PX] 1-36 * page 9, lines 23-30 * * page 16, lines 22,23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [PX] - PALLADINO SILVANO ET AL, "Real-time PCR for the rapid detection of vanA and vanB genes.", DIAGNOSTIC MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (200301), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0732-8893, pages 81 - 84, XP001179294 [PX] 1-22,28-30 * page 82, column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 23 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0732-8893(02)00505-9 | [PX] - PALLADINO SILVANO ET AL, "Rapid detection of vanA and vanB genes directly from clinical specimens and enrichment broths by real-time multiplex PCR assay.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY. UNITED STATES JUN 2003, (200306), vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 2483 - 2486, XP001179283 [PX] 1-22,28-30 * page 2484, column 1, lines 18-27 * * page 2484, column 1, lines 59-65 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.41.6.2483-2486.2003 | [X] - SLOAN L M ET AL, "EVALUATION OF A COMBINED LIGHTCYCLER ASSAY FOR THE DETECTION OF VANA, VANB, AND VANB-2/3 GENES IN ENTEROCOCCI", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, THE SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020519), vol. 102, ISSN 1060-2011, page 143, XP008017759 [X] 1-36 * abstract * | [Y] - HULETSKY A ET AL, "Rapid detection of vancomycin-resistant enterococci directly from rectal swabs by real-time PCR using the Smart Cycler", ABSTRACTS OF THE INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND, 41st Annual Meeting of the Interscience Conference on Antimicrobial Agents and Chemotherapy;Chicago, Illinois, USA; September 22-25, 2001, 2001, (2001), vol. 41, page 409, XP001179281 [Y] 1-36 * page 409, lines 1,2 * * page 409, lines 5-11 * | [Y] - GRISOLD ANDREA J ET AL, "Detection of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus and simultaneous confirmation by automated nucleic acid extraction and real-time PCR.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY. UNITED STATES JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 2392 - 2397, XP009025117 [Y] 1-36 * page 2393, lines 22-47 * * table 1 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.40.7.2392-2397.2002 | [Y] - LightCycler-FastStart DNA MAster Hybridization Probes, technical Manual, OCTOBER 1999, ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH, XP002268864 [Y] 16-18 * page 5, paragraph 3.6.1 * | [YD] - ARTHUR M. ET AL., "Enterococcus faecium transposon Tn1546 transposase, resolvase, vanR, vanS, vanH, vanA, vanX, vanY and teicoplanin resistance protein (vanZ) genes, complete cds.", EMBL, (19930325), Database accession no. M97297, XP002269644 [YD] 2,3 * the whole document * | [YD] - PATEL R. ET AL., "Enterococcus faecalis vancomycin resistance protein vanB gene, partial cds.", EMBL, (19970306), Database accession no. U72704, XP002269645 [YD] 29,30 * the whole document * | [YD] - PATEL R. ET AL., "Enterococcus faecium vancomycin resistance protein B (vanB) gene, partial cds.", EMBL, (19970704), Database accession no. U94528, XP002269646 [YD] 29,30 * abstract * | [A] - PETRICH A K ET AL, "Direct detection of vanA and vanB genes in clinical specimens for rapid identification of vancomycin resistant enterococci (VRE) using multiplex PCR", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (199908), vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 0890-8508, pages 275 - 281, XP004441556 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1999.0250 | [A] - SALMON M, "TECHNOSCOPE: LA PCR EN TEMPS REEL", BIOFUTUR, BIOFUTUR, PARIS, FR, (200202), vol. 219, ISSN 0294-3506, pages 2 - 8, XP001106456 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * |