EP1407953 - Linkage for draw-bars of rail vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2009/03] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Bartel, Manfred Herderstrasse 4 02906 Niesky / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/16] | Application number, filing date | 03021512.3 | 24.09.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | DE2002146428 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10246428 | [2007/34] |
Former [2004/16] | DE2002146428 | 07.10.2002 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407953 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407953 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B61G9/24, B61G7/10 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B61G7/10 (EP);
B61G9/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, IT, LI [2005/01] |
Former [2004/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Richtgelenk für Kuppelstangen von Schienenfahrzeugen | [2004/16] | English: | Linkage for draw-bars of rail vehicles | [2004/16] | French: | Articulation pour barres d'attelage de véhicule ferroviaires | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 04.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB417082 (SCHARFENBERGKUPPLUNG AG) [A] * figures 3,6 *; | [A]US4545304 (BRODEUR RENE H [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1084929 (DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1086870 (DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]EP1342637 (BARTEL MANFRED [DE]) [PA] 1 * abstract *; | [ED]DE10210059 (BARTEL MANFRED [DE]) |