EP1382333 - Use of beta 3 adrenergic receptor agonists in the treatment of dysuria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/01] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Kiyoshi 2-1-28, Minamiochiai Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 654-0153 / JP | 02 /
Sakurai, Minoru 2-18-1-A206, Haradamotomachi Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0808 / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Naoaki 15-1-221, Tonomachi Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1126 / JP | 04 /
Hosoi, Kumi 91-2-A305. Futatsuya Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1128 / JP | 05 /
Tomishima, Yasuyo 2-2-1-1420, Ohgi Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0027 / JP | 06 /
Takasugi, Hisashi 3-116-10, Mozu Umekitacho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8031 / JP | 07 /
Sogabe, Hajime 3-10-21-102, Daidou Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0011 / JP | 08 /
Ishikawa, Hirofumi 27-E-502, Shinashiyakami Suita-shi Osaka 565-0804 / JP | 09 /
Hanioka, Naomi 2-12-12-A908, Nishijyuku Minoo-shi Osaka 562-0034 / JP | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021612.1 | 25.03.1999 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | AU1998PP02826 | 06.04.1998 Original published format: AU PP282698 | AU1998PP05058 | 04.08.1998 Original published format: AU PP505898 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1382333 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1382333 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382333 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, A61K31/223, A61K31/404, A61K31/4045, A61K31/426, A61K31/44, A61K31/4402, A61K31/4406, A61K31/4409, A61K31/4468, A61K31/495, A61K31/501, A61K31/5375, A61P13/02 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
C07D213/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/223 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K31/4406 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409 (EP,US);
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C215/46 (EP,US);
C07C217/30 (EP,US);
C07C217/74 (EP,US);
C07C219/24 (EP,US);
C07C229/18 (EP,US);
C07C229/50 (EP,US);
C07C233/25 (EP,US);
C07C233/43 (EP,US);
C07C233/80 (EP,US);
C07C235/20 (EP,US);
C07C235/24 (EP,US);
C07C237/48 (EP,US);
C07C271/24 (EP,US);
C07C271/30 (EP,US);
C07C271/58 (EP,US);
C07C275/22 (EP,US);
C07C279/22 (EP,US);
C07C307/02 (EP,US);
C07C307/10 (EP,US);
C07C311/08 (EP,US);
C07C311/18 (EP,US);
C07C317/32 (EP,US);
C07C323/25 (EP,US);
C07C323/41 (EP,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D209/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/26 (EP,US);
C07D213/73 (EP,US);
C07D213/85 (EP,US);
C07D233/60 (EP,US);
C07D235/26 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/06 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2602/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2004/04] | Title | German: | Verwendung von beta-3-adrenergen-Rezeptoren Agonisten in der Behandlung von Dysurie | [2004/04] | English: | Use of beta 3 adrenergic receptor agonists in the treatment of dysuria | [2004/04] | French: | Emploi d'agonistes des récepteurs adrénergiques béta 3 dans le traitement de la dysurie | [2008/38] |
Former [2004/04] | Emploi d'agonistes des récepteurs adrergéniques beta 3 dans le traitement de la dysurie | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99909333.9 / EP1070046 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Request for further processing for: | 13.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.03.2009 | LU | 25.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | [2011/21] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0023385 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [DY] 1,5,7-10 * abstract *; | [DY]EP0211721 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [DY] 1,4,7-10 * abstract *; | [DY]EP0659737 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [DY] 1,2,7-10 * abstract *; | [DY]US5561142 (FISHER MICHAEL H [US], et al) [DY] 1,3,7-10 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9715549 (TOKYO TANABE CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10; | [DY]WO9725311 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al)[DY] 1,6-10; | [PLY]EP0882707 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PLY] 1,6-10 * abstract *; | [PLY]EP0940387 (TOKYO TANABE CO [JP]) [PLY] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * |