EP1403521 - Pump having one inlet and two outlets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIDEC SHIBAURA CORPORATION 13-10, Ekimaecho, Obama-shi Fukui-ken 917-8588 / JP | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirokazu Kishimoto 13-10, Ekimae-cho, Obama-shi Fukui 917-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kouichi Sadakane 13-10, Ekimae-cho, Obama-shi Fukui 917-8588 / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021749.1 | 25.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | JP20020282002 | 26.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002282002 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403521 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1403521 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
F04D15/0016 (EP);
F04D29/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pumpe mit einem Einlass und zwei Auslässen | [2004/14] | English: | Pump having one inlet and two outlets | [2004/14] | French: | Pompe à une entreé et à deux sorties | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.04.2006 | IT | 19.04.2006 | DE | 20.07.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 19.04.2006 | |
DE | 20.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB817802 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, lines 88-128 * * figure 4 *; | [X]DE3442907 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4679983 (PIETRYK ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE4330507 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 23 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE19745737 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 5, lines 1-15 * * figure 5 *; | [X]WO9927836 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 10, lines 21-26 * * page 11, lines 8-22 * * figures 12,13 * |