EP1381029 - Distributed voice recognition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Paul E. 9075 La Jolla Shores Lane La Jolla CA 92037 / US | 02 /
Chang, Chienchung P.O. Box 3874 Rancho Santa Fe CA 92067-3874 / US | [2004/36] |
Former [2004/03] | 01 /
Jacobs, Paul E. 9075 La Jolla Shores Lane La Jolla CA 92037 / US | ||
02 /
Chang, Chienchung 11456 Cypress Terrace San Diego CA 92131 / US | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Walsh, Michael Joseph TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03021806.9 | 20.12.1994 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | US19930173247 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: US 173247 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381029 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/28 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G10L15/30 (EP,US);
G10L15/02 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/48] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, LI | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufgeteiltes Spracherkennungssystem | [2004/03] | English: | Distributed voice recognition system | [2004/03] | French: | Système distribué de reconnaissance vocale | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/08] | 05.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/08] | Appeal following examination | 03.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T0593/08 | 30.01.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.06.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 30.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95904956.0 / EP0736211 | Divisional application(s) | EP08152546.1 / EP1942487 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BURSTEIN A ET AL, "Using speech recognition in a personal communications system", DISCOVERING A NEW WORLD OF COMMUNICATIONS. CHICAGO, JUNE 14 - 18, 1992. BOUND TOGETHER WITH B0190700, VOL. 3, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920614), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-0599-X, pages 1717 - 1721, XP010061901 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1717, paragraph 1 * * page 1720, paragraph 5 - page 1721 * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1992.268002 | [X] - "SPEECH RECOGNITION FOR TELEPHONE ACCESS SYSTEMS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19910501), vol. 33, no. 12, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 106 - 109, XP000121606 [X] 1-17 * page 107, paragraph 3 * * page 108, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * figures 2-4 * | Examination | DE3519915 |