Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7002113 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2006 | B2 | US2005056635 | 17.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003097157 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003097153 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003322390 | 16.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3988942B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2007 | B2 | JP2004319953 | 11.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003097157 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003097153 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003322390 | 16.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1465459 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2006 | B1 | EP1465459 | 06.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003097157 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003097153 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003322390 | 16.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60305294T | 21.09.2006 | T2 | DE60305294D1 | 22.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003097157 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003097153 | 31.03.2003 | JP2003322390 | 16.09.2003 |