EP1403547 - Creep torque control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states AISIN AI Co., Ltd. 1, Shiroyama, Kojima-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Aisin Ai Co., Ltd. 1, Shiroyama, Kojima-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haneda, Yoshitomi 1-37-18-202, Midori-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Okada, Nobuyuki 17-4, Minami-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Taguchi, Yoshinori 5-25 Imaike-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Masaru 64, Shitamachi Tsutsumi-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Terakawa, Tomomitsu 77-9, Nihongi Nihongi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Miyazaki, Takeshige 2-5-3-102, Midori-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021952.1 | 29.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | JP20020284752 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002284752 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1403547 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1403547 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/06 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
F16D48/08 (EP);
B60W30/18063 (EP);
F16D48/06 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2530/10 (EP);
B60W2552/15 (EP);
B60W2710/022 (EP);
B60W2710/027 (EP);
F16D2500/3107 (EP);
F16D2500/3108 (EP);
F16D2500/3166 (EP);
F16D2500/50841 (EP);
F16D2500/5106 (EP);
F16D2500/70264 (EP);
F16D2500/7044 (EP);
F16H2312/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/12] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kriechmoment- Steuerungsgerät | [2004/14] | English: | Creep torque control apparatus | [2004/14] | French: | Dispositf de commande de couple de rampage | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.02.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000186726 ; | [A]DE10016582 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] ** claims 1,8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000186726 A 20000704 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0777226 |