EP1518812 - Elevator shaft wiring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG SCHWEIZERISCHE KABEL-, GUMMI- UND KUNSTSTOFFWERKE CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG SCHWEIZERISCHE KABEL-, GUMMI- UND KUNSTSTOFFWERKE CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pohle, Michael, Dätwyler AG Schweizerische Kabel-, Gummi- und Kunststoffwerke 6460 Altdorf / CH | 02 /
Nohl, Andreas, Dätwyler AG Schweizerische Kabel-, Gummi- und Kunststoffwerke 6460 Altdorf / CH | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Lippich, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwalt Samson & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022109.7 | 29.09.2003 | [2005/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518812 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518812 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/06, B66B13/22 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B66B7/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI [2005/51] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufzugsschachtverkabelung | [2005/13] | English: | Elevator shaft wiring | [2005/13] | French: | Câblage d'une gaine d'ascenseur | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04116074 ; | [A]FR2452769 (NKF GROEP BV [NL]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4434377 (SHIMA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0187876 (THYSSEN MAN AUFZUEGE [DE]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1321423 (SCHMITT & SOHN AUFZUGWERKE [DE]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920807), vol. 016, no. 366, Database accession no. (M - 1291), & JP04116074 A 19920416 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-23 * abstract * |