EP1411744 - Optical multi-ring network for burst data communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doh, Sang-Hyun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Se-Kang Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Ki-Cheol Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | 04 /
Oh, Yun-Je Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | 05 /
Kang, Byung-Chang Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022189.9 | 30.09.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | KR20020062819 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: KR 2002062819 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411744 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411744 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411744 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04L12/44 (KR);
H04Q2011/0016 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0064 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0084 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/05] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Mehrringnetzwerk zur Burstdatenübertragung | [2004/17] | English: | Optical multi-ring network for burst data communication | [2004/17] | French: | Réseau optique à plusieurs anneaux pour transférer des données en rafale | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 03.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.10.2011 | [2013/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9825365 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [A] 1-16 * figure 5 * * page 4, lines 16-18 * * page 17, line 29 - page 18, line 19 *; | [A]EP1089498 (CIT ALCATEL [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - LE LIGNE M ET AL, "Protection of optical rings interconnected by an ATM cross-connect", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON MULTIWAVELENGTH OPTICAL NETWORKS: DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND NETWORK, London, (19980618), pages 5 - 1, XP006504046 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |