EP1381265 - Tape guide, magazine and system at a component mounting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mydata Automation AB Adolfsbergsvägen 11 168 66 Bromma / SE | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergström, Johan Fältmarskalksvägen 45 167 32 Bromma / SE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03022446.3 | 16.12.1999 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | SE19980004495 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: SE 9804495 | SE19990001057 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9901057 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381265 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381265 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H05K13/086 (EP,US);
H05K13/04 (KR);
H05K13/0419 (EP,US);
H05K13/087 (EP,US);
Y10S242/912 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1105 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1906 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1944 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53004 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53174 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53178 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/03] | Title | German: | Bandführungsvorrichtung, Magazin und Systeme für eine Bauteilbestückungsmaschine | [2004/03] | English: | Tape guide, magazine and system at a component mounting machine | [2004/03] | French: | Guide bande, magasin et système pour une machine de montage de composants | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 16.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99965658.0 / EP1149523 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | LU | 16.12.2007 | IE | 17.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/34] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO8600778 (MYDATA AUTOMATION AB [SE]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4820369 (KUBO MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5053103 (FRITSCH ADALBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5725140 (WEBER JEROME L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |