EP1507205 - Multi-site remote-copy system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamura, Takashige Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Oeda, Takashi Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Satoo, Takao Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2005/07] | Application number, filing date | 03022557.7 | 02.10.2003 | [2005/07] | Priority number, date | JP20030207004 | 11.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003207004 | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1507205 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
G06F11/2082 (EP,US);
G06F11/2058 (EP,US);
G06F11/2069 (EP,US);
G06F11/2074 (EP,US);
G06F11/2076 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99955 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multi-site Fernkopiersystem | [2005/07] | English: | Multi-site remote-copy system | [2005/07] | French: | Système multisite de réplication de données distante | [2005/07] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 30.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |