Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
02.06.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
11.11.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
05.11.2005 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
19.10.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
19.10.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
14.10.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.07.2005 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.07.2005 | Change - applicant | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
15.06.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.05.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
14.05.2005 | Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.05.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.04.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
17.12.2004 | First examination report | |
14.12.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.08.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
27.08.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |