Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50302059D1 | 02.02.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10315778 | 07.04.2003 | DE50302059 | 06.10.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1466786 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2005 | B1 | EP1466786 | 13.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10315778 | 07.04.2003 |