EP1415874 - Battery exchange system for an industrial truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [2010/11] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchmann, Michael Möllner Landstrasse 12b 21509 Glinde / DE | 02 /
Neumann, Udo Bahnhofstrasse 13 22946 Brunsbek / DE | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Geirhos, Johann, et al Geirhos & Waller Partnerschaft Landshuter Allee 14 80637 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Geirhos, Johann, et al Geirhos & Waller Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Landshuter Allee 14 80637 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Geirhos, Johann, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022686.4 | 07.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | DE2002150140 | 28.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10250140 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415874 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1415874 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415874 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/06 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B66F9/0754 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/47] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Batteriewechselsystem für ein Flurförderzeug | [2004/19] | English: | Battery exchange system for an industrial truck | [2004/19] | French: | Système de changement de batterie pour un chariot de manutention | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2009 | 12.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | GB | 07.10.2010 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/14] | IT | 17.03.2010 | |
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | SE | 17.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH08165094 ; | [XY]EP0030928 (BYGG OCH TRANSPORTEKONOMIE AB [SE]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 16; figure - * * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 16 * [Y] 6-15; | [Y]US5595442 (GLASS GERALD E [US], et al) [Y] 12,13 * column 1, line 56 - line 63; figure - *; | [A]GB2317872 (BT ROLATRUC LTD [GB]) [A] 12 * page 2, line 5 - line 31; figure - * * page 3, paragraph 3 ** page 3, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]US5998963 (AARSETH EINAR [US]) [Y] 6,7,10,11 * column 3, line 13 - column 7, line 42; figure - *; | [A]WO0058139 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al) [A] 12,13 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 30; figure - *; | [Y]EP1095831 (FIAT OM CARRELLI ELEVATORI [IT]) [Y] 14,15 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 48; figure - * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08165094 A 19960625 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * [A] 6 |