blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1408415

EP1408415 - Circuit for determining the controller sending a wake-up-signal to a bus system with several further controllers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUDI AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
AUDI AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bleier, Liebhard
Haslangstrasse 45
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2004/16]
Representative(s)Patzelt, Heike Anna Maria
AUDI AG
Patentabteilung
Postfach 11 44
74148 Neckarsulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/16]Patzelt, Heike
AUDI AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 44
74148 Neckarsulm / DE
Application number, filing date03022708.609.10.2003
[2004/16]
Priority number, dateDE200214763711.10.2002         Original published format: DE 10247637
[2004/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1408415
Date:14.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1408415
Date:09.06.2004
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1408415
Date:04.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F13/38, B60R16/02, H04L12/40, G05B23/02
[2004/24]
CPC:
H04L12/40039 (EP); H04L12/12 (EP); H04L2012/40215 (EP);
H04L2012/40273 (EP); Y02D30/50 (EP)
Former IPC [2004/16]G06F13/38, B60R16/02, H04L12/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/09]
Former [2004/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zur Ermittlung eines ein wake-up-Signal sendenden Steuergeräts eines Bus-Systems mit mehreren weiteren Steuergeräten[2004/16]
English:Circuit for determining the controller sending a wake-up-signal to a bus system with several further controllers[2004/16]
French:Circuit pour déterminer le contrôleur ayant envoyé un signal de réveil à un bus comportant plusieurs autres contrôleurs[2004/16]
Examination procedure25.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/35]
04.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2005Fee for grant paid
03.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0620664  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19611945  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5781585  (DORNER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.