EP1407936 - Vehicular electronic control system and electronic control unit, program, and storing member for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukushima, Toshiyuki Denso Corp. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Kura, Kaname Denso Corp. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Masahiro Denso Corp. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Kida, Yoshiaki Denso Corp. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022791.2 | 10.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | JP20020299082 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002299082 | JP20030308999 | 01.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003308999 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1407936 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1407936 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407936 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B60R16/0231 (EP,US);
B60R16/0232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/16] |
Former [2004/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeug-Kontrollsystem und elektronische Kontrolleinheit, Programm und Speichereinheit für dasselbe | [2006/30] | English: | Vehicular electronic control system and electronic control unit, program, and storing member for the same | [2004/16] | French: | Système de commande pour véhicules et unité de commande, programme et support d'enregistrement pour ce programme | [2004/16] |
Former [2004/16] | Fahrzeug-Kontrollsystem und elektronische Kontrolleinheit, Programm und Speichereinheit für das selbe | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08265880 ; | [E]DE10219832 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [E] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08265880 A 19961011 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * abstract * |