EP1418768 - Front-accessible communications port for enclosed electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Square D Company 1415 South Roselle Road Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kennedy, Robert A. 2237 Oakleigh Drive Murfreesboro, TN 37129 / US | 02 /
Pollard, Gary 185 Wakeline Drive Wendell, NC 27591 / US | 03 /
Clark, James F. 506 Richard Road Murfreesboro, TN 37129 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022801.9 | 07.10.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | US20020416612P | 07.10.2002 Original published format: US 416612 P | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418768 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418768 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/02, H04L12/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04Q1/025 (EP,US);
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/10 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/18 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/50] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Von vorne zugängliches Kommunikationsport für eingeschlossene elektrische Einrichtungen | [2004/20] | English: | Front-accessible communications port for enclosed electrical equipment | [2004/20] | French: | Porte de communication accessible par devant pour équipement électrique enfermé | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 06.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5247454 (FARRINGTON RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]EP0966147 (SIECOR OPERATIONS LLC [US]) [A] * paragraph [0014] *; | [A]EP1073285 (BELGACOM MOBILE S A NV [BE]) [A] * column 4, line 4 - line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2002010518 (REID DREW A [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0506]; figure 31B *; | [X]US6378111 (BRENNER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 4, line 12 - line 34 *; | [PA]US2003084112 (CURRAY TIMOTHY G [US], et al) [PA] * abstract *; | [A] - "Web-Enabled Power Management Solutions", DOCUMENT # 3000HO0104, USA, (200201), URL: http://www.graybar.com/automation/ga_manuals/Brochures/Power/3000HO0104-Web-Enabled%20Sys.pdf, XP002365407 [A] * the whole document * |