blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1408265

EP1408265 - Valve with self-cleaning trim [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC
8100 West Florissant Avenue
St. Louis, MO 63136 / US
[2004/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Alman, Paul T.
1906 Bailey Drive
Marshalltown Iowa 50158 / US
 [2004/16]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2004/16]Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date03022861.308.10.2003
[2004/16]
Priority number, dateUS2002026691008.10.2002         Original published format: US 266910
[2004/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1408265
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1408265
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:F16K47/08, F16K3/24
[2004/16]
CPC:
F16K3/243 (EP,US); F16K47/08 (EP,US); Y10T137/4336 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86734 (EP,US); Y10T137/86791 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/01]
Former [2004/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ventil mit selbstreiningender Drosselvorrichtung[2004/16]
English:Valve with self-cleaning trim[2004/16]
French:Vanne avec intérieur de cage auto-nettoyant[2004/16]
Examination procedure16.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/47]
15.10.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
19.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2005Fee for grant paid
22.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.11.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004HU   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004RO   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004SI   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2341018  (CLAPP REVERE E) [A] 1,13 * page 1, column R, line 7 - page 2, column L, line 18; figure . *;
 [A]US3716069  (REYNOLDS R) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 1 - line 67; figure . *;
 [A]EP0573399  (FISHER CONTROLS INT [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 5, line 56 - column 10, line 56; figures 3-7 *;
 [A]EP0677687  (BTG KAELLE INVENTING AB [SE]) [A] 1,13* figure - *;
 [A]US2002017327  (KAWAAI SHIGEHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077]; figures 9A,10A,11A *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.