EP1416177 - Bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/19] | Bearing and method of assembling the bearing | ||
[2007/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Corporation P.O. Box 134007 Ann Arbor, MI 48113-4007 / US | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states NSK Corporation P.O. Box 134007 Ann Arbor, MI 48113-4007 / US | ||
For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states NSK Corporation P.O. Box 134007 Ann Arbor, MI 48113-4007 / US | ||
For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murata, Shigenori NSK Corporation P.O. Box 134007 Ann Arbor, MI 48113-4007 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022952.0 | 09.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20020272302 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 272302 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1416177 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1416177 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416177 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/18, F16C19/56, F16C43/04 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
F16C33/38 (EP,US);
F16C19/18 (EP,US);
F16C19/505 (EP);
F16C19/56 (US);
F16C43/04 (EP,US);
F16C2360/44 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4968 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | F16C19/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lager | [2007/44] | English: | Bearing | [2007/44] | French: | Roulement | [2007/44] |
Former [2004/19] | Lager sowie Verfahren zum Zusammenbau des Lagers | ||
Former [2004/19] | Bearing and method of assembling the bearing | ||
Former [2004/19] | Palier et procédé d'assemblage de ce palier | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 25.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08226439 ; | [AD]JP2000314428 ; | [XA]US1452603 (HIMES HOWARD P) [X] 1-9 * figures 5,9 * [A] 18,19; | [XA]US4850801 (VALENTINE PETER L [US]) [X] 1-9 * figure 1 * [A] 18,19; | [AD]US5462489 (KAN YOSHIO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-7,10,12-17,20 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6015264 (VIOLETTE JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 18,19; | [AD]US6168316 (PALING NEIL DARREN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-7,12-17 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6231242 (YANO SHUICHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-7,10-17,20 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08226439 A 19960903 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 11-17,20 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000314428 A 20001114 (NSK LTD) [AD] 1,10,11,20 * abstract * |