EP1385036 - Total internal reflection optical switch utilizing a moving droplet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Gongjian 3484 Speno Drive San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 02 /
Robrish, Peter 971 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023270.6 | 29.01.2002 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | US20010871486 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 871486 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385036 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385036 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02, G02F1/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G02B6/3538 (EP,US);
G02B26/004 (EP,US);
G02B6/3544 (EP,US);
G02B6/357 (EP,US);
G02B6/3576 (EP,US);
G02B6/3596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/43] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Auf Totalreflexion beruhender optischer Schalter mit bewegtem Tropfen | [2004/05] | English: | Total internal reflection optical switch utilizing a moving droplet | [2004/05] | French: | Commutateur optique à réflexion interne totale utilisant une gouttelette circulante | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 25.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02002173.9 / EP1262811 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4988157 (JACKEL JANET L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5204921 (KANAI TSUNEO [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5699462 (FOUQUET JULIE E [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 31 * * column 3, line 42 - line 47 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 13 * * column 9, line 22 - line 39 * * column 13, line 38 - column 14, line 9 * * column 15, line 32 - column 16, line 28 * * column 18, line 1 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0938013 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6072924 (SATO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6195478 (FOUQUET JULIE E [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - SKLYAROV O K, "A TWO-POSITION LIGHTGUIDE OPTICAL SWITCH", TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING, BEGELL HOUSE, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (19930701), vol. 48, no. 7, ISSN 0040-2508, pages 1 - 3, XP000539470 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |