EP1411719 - Method and system for converting interlaced video signal to progressive video signal using a color edge detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Law, Patrick 19 Jacklin Circle Milpitas California 95035 / US | 02 /
Neuman, Darren 434-11 Galleria-Drive 95134 San Jose California / US | [2004/20] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
Law, Patrick 19 Jacklin Circle 95035 Milpitas California / US | ||
02 /
Neuman, Darren 434-11 Galleria-Drive 95134 San Jose California / US | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/17] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023445.4 | 17.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | US20020419400P | 18.10.2002 Original published format: US 419400 P | US20020289078 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: US 289078 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411719 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411719 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N7/0142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/33] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Umwandlung eines Zeilensprungvideosignals in ein progressives Videosignal mittels einer Farbkantendetektion | [2004/17] | English: | Method and system for converting interlaced video signal to progressive video signal using a color edge detection | [2004/17] | French: | Méthode et système de conversion de signal vidéo entrelacé en signal vidéo progressif au moyen d'une détection de contour en couleurs | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4947251 (HENTSCHEL CHRISTIAN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0663768 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XA]US2002054236 (WREDENHAGEN FINN G [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0069] , [0078] , [0105] , [0158]; figures 4,5 * [A] 3 |