EP1413694 - Wind sensing awning control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dometic, LLC 2320 Industrial Parkway Elkhart IN 46515 / US | [2009/22] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Dometic Corporation 2320 Industrial Parkway Elkhart, Indiana 46515-0490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, David K. 509 S. Poplar LaGrange Indiana 46761 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023531.1 | 15.10.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | US20020277322 | 22.10.2002 Original published format: US 277322 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1413694 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1413694 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413694 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/02, G01P5/12 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
E04F10/0659 (EP,US);
G01P5/12 (EP,US);
E06B2009/6863 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/18] | E04F10/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | Markisensteuerung mit System zur Feststellung von Wind | [2004/18] | English: | Wind sensing awning control | [2004/18] | French: | Commande d'un store avec détection de vent | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | BE | 12.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IT | 12.08.2009 | NL | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | IE | 15.10.2009 | LU | 15.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GB | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | DK | 30.11.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | DE | 01.05.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
LU | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
LU | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2931956 (MFB NEUWERK MECH FENSTER) [A] 1,6,8,19,27 * page 4, line 4 - page 4, line 8 * * page 6, line 9 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 14 * * page 8, line 26 - page 11, line 23 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0073858 (ACEC [BE]) [A] 10-12,29,38 * page 2, line 9 - page 2, line 14 * * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 1 - page 4, line 29 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US4821568 (KISKE SIEGFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 37 * * column 3, line 39 - column 3, line 57 *; | [Y]US4848147 (BAILEY JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 3,19-23,25-28,30-34,37 * column 1, line 57 - column 1, line 65 * * column 7, line 42 - column 7, line 65 * * figures 2,12 *; | [A]US4860583 (OLSON THOMAS R [US]) [A] 4,6-8,24 * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 51 * * figures 1-4,10,12,13 *; | [XAY]DE9312592U (WIDO WERNER GMBH [DE]) [X] 6,7 * the whole document * [A] 24 [Y] 4,8,9,12-15,18; | [XAY]DE10033831 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 51 - column 2, line 63 * * column 6, line 9 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, line 20 - column 7, line 25 * * column 7, line 38 - column 7, line 48 * * column 10, line 1 - column 10, line 40 * * column 11, line 2 - column 11, line 5 * * column 11, line 38 - column 11, line 44 * * column 11, line 58 - column 11, line 65 * * column 12, line 14 - column 12, line 29 * * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 9 * * figures 1-3; claims 1,6 * [A] 38 [Y] 3,4,8,9,12-15,18-23,25-28,30-34,37 | by applicant | US5225748 | US6111376 |