EP1411391 - Method and apparatus for cooling a reticle during lithographic exposure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Del Puerto, Santiago 14 Lillie Lane Milton New York 12547 / US | 02 /
Galburt, Daniel N. 520 Belden Hill Road Wilton Connecticut 06897 / US | 03 /
McCullough, Andrew W. 20 Aunt Park Lane Newtown Connecticut 06470 / US | 04 /
Roux, Stephen 17 Rocky Hill Road New Fairfield Connecticut 06812 / US | 05 /
Ottens, Joost Jeroen Opperstehei 36 Veldhoven 5508 TR / NL | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023662.4 | 17.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | US20020273405 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: US 273405 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411391 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411391 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G03F7/70716 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
G03F7/70875 (EP,US);
F28F3/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/25] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kühlung eines Retikels während einer lithographischen Belichtung | [2004/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for cooling a reticle during lithographic exposure | [2004/17] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de refroidissement d'un réticule pendant une exposition lithographique | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10209042 ; | [XY]US3171956 (COLEMAN JOHN W, et al) [X] 1,8,9,14-24,29 * column 3 - column 5 * [Y] 2-5,10-13,25-28; | [A]US5944097 (GUNGOR MEHMET N [US], et al) [A] 30-48* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1077393 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 10-13 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0107] * * figures 17,18 *; | [XA]US6215642 (SOGARD MICHAEL [US]) [X] 30-33,38,39 * the whole document * [A] 34-37,40-48; | [A]EP1124161 (ASM LITHOGRAPHY BV [NL]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2002027644 (BISSCHOPS THEODORUS HUBERTUS J [NL]) [X] 1,9,14,16-18,20-24,29 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,10-13,25-28; | [PXA]EP1286221 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1,6-9,14,16-18,20-24,29 * the whole document * [PA] 30-48 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10209042 A 19980807 (LG SEMICON CO LTD) [Y] 2-5,25-28 * abstract * |