EP1437788 - Stacked fuel cell and method for its maintenance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Toshiro, Mitsubishi Heavy ind., Ltd. Hiroshima R&D Center 4-6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Moriga, Takuya, Mitsubishi Heavy ind., Ltd. Hiroshima R&D Center 4-6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Ito, Hideki, Mitsubishi Heavy ind., Ltd. Hiroshima R&D Center 4-6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | 04 /
Kajiwara, Tomoyuki, Mitsubishi Heavy ind., Ltd. Hiroshima R&D Center 4-6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | 05 /
Yamada, Tamotsu, Mitsubishi Heavy ind., Ltd. Hiroshima R&D Center 4-6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023828.1 | 20.10.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | JP20030001834 | 08.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003001834 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1437788 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1437788 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/247 (EP,US);
H01M8/249 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffzellenstapel und Verfahren zur Wartung | [2004/29] | English: | Stacked fuel cell and method for its maintenance | [2004/29] | French: | Empilement de piles à combustible et méthode pour la maintenance | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02144857 ; | [A]JP2001126750 ; | [X]US4175165 (ADLHART OTTO J [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 8, line 9 - line 15 *; | [X]US4692391 (HIROTA TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 8 - line 68; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US5789091 (WOZNICZKA BOGUSLAW [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 60 *; | [PX]WO03079471 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-6 * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 11 * * claims 1,2,4,7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900823), vol. 014, no. 391, Database accession no. (E - 0968), & JP02144857 A 19900604 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001126750 A 20010511 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |